+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 384
- Effective date(s) 05/08/2015
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0483)
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 3, PNV 5
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0483)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0183)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 24, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor