+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 683
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 13, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor