+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/21/2014
- Pub. Ch. 742
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0847)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 1
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0987)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1004)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1162)
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/7/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/3/2014
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
March 19, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor