+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 350
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment 8
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/2/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0502)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0511)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 7 - HA0512)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0501)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0505)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 8 - HA0515)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA0510)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 74, Nays 11, PNV 7
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/19
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0329)
- Reset on cal. for 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0372)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (9)
May 3, 2019: : Motion to Concur in House Amendment #8
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur in House Amendment #8
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY PARKINSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY BECK PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY COCHRAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor