+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor