+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8