+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/19/18
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/27/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/20/2018
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 27, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8