+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. H&W Comm.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014
- Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/12/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0632
Amendment 1-0 to SB1818
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor