+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 740
- Effective date(s) 04/21/2014
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 12, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor