+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/09/2015
- Pub. Ch. 85
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 4
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 10, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 10, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor