+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 11
February 27, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor