+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 826
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2015
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 1
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1229)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014
- Reset on Regular cal. for 4/09/14
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2014
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Reset on Next Available Regular cal.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 96
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
March 20, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 9