+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor