+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 996
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0780)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0643)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor