+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 693
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1001)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0883)
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1001
Amendment 1-0 to SB1794
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 25, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor