+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor