+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/9/2016
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/2/2106
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/17/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor