+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 953
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014; 01/01/2015
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 2
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1088)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0749)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 0
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0777)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0777
Amendment 1-0 to SB1768
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 30
April 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
March 12, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor