+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/11/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor