+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 801
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0688)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0645)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor