+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 950
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
March 2, 2016: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor