+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
- Re-refer to S. Cal. Comm.
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2018: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor