+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 137
- Effective date(s) 04/12/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 19, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9