+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 1, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor