+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 728
- Effective date(s) 04/18/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/15/2018
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
February 13, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 13, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor