+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. F, W&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0732
Amendment 1-0 to SB1734
+ − Vote
March 4, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor