+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/15/2020
- Pub. Ch. 783
On July 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0847)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0551)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0675)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0505)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/25/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/18/2020
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
June 4, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2020: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
March 10, 2020: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor