+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 946
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1118)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0811)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 23, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
March 16, 2016: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor