+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 985
- Effective date(s) 05/22/2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 1
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1294)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1135)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1134)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/8/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4-1-14
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 28
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
April 8, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor