+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 566
- Effective date(s) 03/19/2020
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/13/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 99
February 13, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
February 5, 2020: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor