+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 823
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1017)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0733)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/7/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/29/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 23, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2016: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor