+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 868
- Effective date(s) 05/01/2014
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1021)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 3
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0994)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0954)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/9/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor