+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 498
- Effective date(s) 05/01/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 5, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/5/2014
- S. Reset on Regular Cal. for 2-5-14
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/3/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/28/2014
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0576
Amendment 1-0 to SB1700
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
January 28, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor