+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
- Pub. Ch. 403
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0470)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0215)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0445)
- Am. 3 tabled.
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 5
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0470
Amendment 1-0 to SB0170
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 30
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 5
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 29
April 10, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9