+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 950
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0612)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0594)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0603)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/12/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 12, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Bell
- Yeas: 33
February 12, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 33
February 5, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (117)
Type:
Primary Sponsor