+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0691)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/3/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0691
Amendment 1-0 to SB1689
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor