+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 575
- Effective date(s) 03/08/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/17/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/10/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 10, 2016: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor