+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
- Pub. Ch. 721
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0619)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0501)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/22/2022
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/8/2022
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 28, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
February 22, 2022: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor