+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor