+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 650
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor