+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1076
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9