+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor