+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2017
- Pub. Ch. 1037
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1223)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1054)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/20/2016
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1054)
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1223)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0648)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9