+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 662
- Effective date(s) 04/02/2020
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0628)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/19/2020
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0628)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/19/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 8
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
February 19, 2020: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor