+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 601
- Effective date(s) 03/20/2020
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0568)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/12/2020
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0568)
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0478)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/10/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 9
March 5, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
February 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2020: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor