+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1122)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/8/14
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend, as amended
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1122
Amendment 1-0 to SB1635
+ − Vote
April 8, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10