+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/4/2014
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 2/26/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1016
Amendment 1-0 to SB1633
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
March 26, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor