+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 689
- Effective date(s) 04/15/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0799)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0798)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0670)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal Comm.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0670
Amendment 1-0 to SB1624
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 11, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 6