+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 587
- Effective date(s) 03/10/2016
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 20, PNV 0
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0629)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0569)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 5
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/17/2016
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0500)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/8/2016
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/2/2016
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY JONES PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 22
February 25, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 22
February 25, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 22
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
February 2, 2016: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor