+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pr. Ch. 12
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 9, PNV 5
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
April 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor